Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Below, Amy filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2012 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Receipt
Date: April 03, 2018Accounting - Subsequent Petition
Date: February 03, 2017Receipt
Date: August 18, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting Seventh and Final Accounting; Continued Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting Seventh and Final Accounting; continued from 4/19/22, 7/19/22, 9/27/22 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The Court will hear from counsel regarding the status of filing the Seventh & Final Account. |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting Seventh Account Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The hearing on the Seventh and Final Accounting is set for January 24, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. The hearing on October 18, 2022 is off calendar and no appearances are required. |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The Court will hear from counsel regarding the status of filing the Seventh and Final Account. |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting Seventh and Final Accounting; continued from 4/19/22, 7/19/22 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.