Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 1978 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Proof or Affidavit of Publication
Date: August 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting Second Account Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person Only Annual Review Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Regarding Cost Assessment PR 1851.5
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration and Order re Conservatorship Investigation | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate Based upon the Court Investigator's report filed on November 18, 2022 the conservatorship remains necessary and appropriate and shall continue. Fees are deferred. The court investigator information sheet is due by October 10, 2023 with a review hearing on November 21, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel shall submit a form of order within two weeks. The Court will hear from Mr. Latimer. |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Regarding Cost Assessment PR 1851.5
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person Only
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Re. Cost Assessment and Right to Object |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.