Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Moore, James A, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Samuel T. McAdam presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel T. McAdam Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryConservatorship |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time32 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING PETITIONS FOR TEMPORARY AND GENERAL CONSERVATORSHIP WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND VACATING FUTURE COURT HEARING ON GENERAL PETITON | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE MCADAM FOR REVIEW OF ORDER DISMISSING |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROBATE MINUTE ORDER Petition Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REPORT* Notes: STATUS REPORT RE: DISAPPEARANCE OF PROPOSED TEMPORARY CONSERVATEE Action: MH | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | LODGING OF DOCUMENTS Notes: ORDER APPT TEMP CONSERVATOR | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Investigator ORD APPT CRT INVEST |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE MCADAM ORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Citation CITATION FILED |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.