Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Yolo County Public Guardian, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Janet Gaard presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 20, 2018 |
CategoryConservatorship |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time13 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROBATE MINUTE ORDER Petition Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER DISMISSING PETITION | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: UNIFORM STATUTORY FORM POWER OF ATTORNEY | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROBATE MINUTE ORDER Petition Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
*Citation CITATION FILED Notes: W/PRF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON: DONA MAREK ON 11/20/18 |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Information CONFDNTL SUPP INFO Notes: CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition Appoint Temporary Conservator - Person & Estate PET APPT TEMP CONS |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
*Citation CITATION ISSUED Notes: CITATION ISSUED TO DONNA MAREK |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: CAPACITY DECLARATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.