Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stodden, Susan K., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2017 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time50 days |
Annual Review
Date: September 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Annual Review
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Annual Review Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | *Guardianship Annual Status Reports Sent | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Guardianship Status Report Sent | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Annual Review
Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Filed REP PAYEE REIMBURSEMENT SUMMARY; PARKER, RHIANNON |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Status Report Filed CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion Guardians not present |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROBATE MINUTE ORDER *Review GUARDIANSHIP ANNUAL REVIEW Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Guardianship Annual Status Reports Sent CONF GUARD REPORT Notes: CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.