Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Buckley, Margaret Mary, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2015 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filed RECEIPT OF* Notes: DISTRIBUTION SIGNED BY DANIEL BUCKLEY |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filed RECEIPT OF* Notes: DISTRIBUTION SIGNED BY CATHERINE BUCKLEY |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROBATE MINUTE ORDER Conservatorship Review Accounting ACCOUNT AND REPORT Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reference List PROBATE CHECK LIST Notes: PROBATE CHECK LIST |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition Granted PETN GRANTED Notes: FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND ALLOWING COMPENSATION TO ATTORNEY FOR ADMINISTRATOR FOR ORDINARY SERVICES AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND ALLOWING COMPENSATION TO ATTORNEY FOR ADMINISTRATOR FOR ORDINARY SERVICES AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION | |
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: AU; WAIVERS OF NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION SIGNED BY DANIEL BUCKLEY AND CATHERINE BUCKLEY AND STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION AND BENEFICIARIES' APPROVAL OF REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION TO ATTORNEY FOR ADMINISTRATOR FOR ORDINARY SERVICES AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | LODGING OF DOCUMENTS Notes: ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND ALLOWING COMPENSATION TO ATTORNEY FOR ADMINISTRATOR FOR ORDINARY SERVICES AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: CHECK #12796 |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION* Notes: FOR ENTRY OF ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION AND BENEFICIARIES' APPROVAL OF REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION TO ATTORNEY FOR ADMINISTRATOR FOR ORDINARY SERVICES AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.