Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cohen, Nancy R. filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2012 |
CategoryConservatorship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1410 days |
Petition
Date: September 21, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
BIENNIAL REVIEW/2ND ACCT AND RPT
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: RECEIPT FROM SAN DIEGO SUPERIOR COURT | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: CERTIFIED MAILED GREEN CARD | |
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Receipt RECT RE CHG VENUE Notes: RECEIPT RE CHANGE OF VENUE SAN DIEGO SUPERIOR COURT |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC TRANS PAPERS/PLD Notes: NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL OF PAPERS & PLEADINGS |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
115 PETITION TO/FOR* Petition TO TRANSER PROCEEDINGS TO SAN DIEGO COUNTY SPIEGEL PRES PETN TO TRANSFER TO SAN DIEGO COUNTY-GRANTED Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition Granted PETN GRANTED |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Granted ORD GRANTING* Notes: PETITION TO TRANSER PROCEEDINGS TO SAN DIEGO COUNTY, CALIFORNIA, FILED BY CONSERVATOR NANCY R. COHEN |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 9/21/15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.