Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mayberry, Janene Renee, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2007 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time111 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letters Issued Guardianship LTR OF GUARDIANSHIP Notes: LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP |
|
June 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Petition COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER PRESNT. COURT GRANTED PETITION FOR GUARDIANSHIP AS PRAYED. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF AMANDA R. CAMP |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CALENDAR FILE AWAY |
|
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING* Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON GUARDIANSHIP by Janene Mayberry |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
PETITIONER PRESENT W/ATT SMITH. COURT DIRECTED COUNSEL TO PROVIDE NOTICE TO FATHER. TEMPORARY ORDERS TO REMAIN IN EFFECT.
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event | REPORT* Notes: REPORT OF COURT INVESTIGATOR | |
April 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Investigator ORD APPT CRT INVEST |
|
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
PETITION ATTY M. SMITH PRESENT,COUNSEL TO PREPARE ORDER FOR COURT INVESTIGATOR; TEMP GUARDIANSHIP CONTINUED; 5-7-07 8;30AM DEPT 11 PETITION
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Filed CASE SUMMARY SHEET Notes: CASE SUMMARY SHEET FOR UNIFIED FAMILY COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.