Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mumma, Stephen F., Mumma, Thomas S., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2005 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time404 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY BIN |
|
September 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Filed RECEIPT OF* Notes: ON DISTRIBUTION SIGNED SBY THOMAS S. MUMMA, TRUSTEE AND THOMAS L. MUMMA AND GLADYS L. MUMMA 1994 TRUST; STEPHEN F. MUMMA, TRUSTEE OF THE THOMAS L. MUMMA AND GLADYS L. MUMMA 1994 TRUST. |
|
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Petition ATTNY NAKKEN PRESENT. ACCT APPROVED, SETTLED, AND ALLOWED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
July 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: RE: JUDGMENT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER FRW'D TO ATTY UNIT. |
|
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING* Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON REPORT ON WAIVER OF ACCT AND PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION, AND FOR DISTRIBUTION, AND FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION TO ATTYS FOR STATUTORY SERVICES filed by Executors Thomas S. and Stephen F. Mumma |
|
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) WAIVER OF ACCTG Notes: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING BY BENEFICIARY by beneficiary Stewart G. Mumma |
|
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event | REPORT* Notes: REPORT ON WAIVER OF ACCT AND PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION, AND FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION TO ATTYS FOR STATUTORY SERVICES | |
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) WAIVER OF ACCTG Notes: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING by Trustees Thomas S. Mumma and Stephen F. Mumma |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal INV & APPRAISAL Notes: AMENDED PARTRIAL NO 1; PROPERTY TAX CERTIFICATE |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.