Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Asmundson, Ruth Uy, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2004 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time34 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY DISTRIBTION | |
March 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: PROBATE FILE AWAY |
|
March 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
PETITION WITH/BY ATTORNEY: GAMBATESE PETITION GRANTED ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT ORDER SUBMITTED COUNSEL FOR FILING RM 103
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED ALINIA, VIGDIS, SIGRID AND IRENA ASMUNDSON BY MAIL ON 2/28/07: NOT OF HEARING |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SUZANNE HAMILTON |
|
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING* Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR PRELIMINARY DISTRIB UTION by Ruth Uy Asmundson |
|
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Petition PETN* Notes: PETITION FOR PRELIMINARY DISTRIBUTION |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal INV & APPRAISAL Notes: SUPPLEMENTAL - IN THE AMT OF $17,011.68 |
|
August 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
August 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal INV & APPRAISAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.