Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bernie Marks, Kimberley Cruz Marks, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Speiller, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryEstablishment Of Special Needs Trust |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2023 | Hearing | Accounting Review Hearing | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting Review Hearing
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting Review Hearing
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Supplement to Petition | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Petition to Administer Estate W/ Proof of Service | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition to Establish a Special Needs Trust |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.