Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Alwanda M Farris filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Speiller, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 25, 2019 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time52 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Hearing | Discharge Review Hearing | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting Status Report: 12200
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting Review Hearing
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal- FINAL / SUPPLEMENTAL #1 / PROPERTY TAX CERTIFICATE Inventory & Appraisal |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Report - PrC 12200 | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Action | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof Of Service By Mail Proof of Service - Mail |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Inventory Review
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Stat Closure: PR Permanent Letters Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.