Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garcia Abrego, Luis Gustavo, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph M. Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph M. Quinn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Appointment Of Guardian Of Person |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time91 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON AS TO MINOR GARCIA ABREGO, LUIS GUSTAVO WAS TERMINATED BY OPERATION OF LAW ON OCT-24-2019 REACHED THE AGE OF 18 | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | GUARDIANSHIP CLOSED BY OPERATION OF LAW | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON AS TO MINOR GARCIA ABREGO, LUIS GUSTAVO WAS TERMINATED BY OPERATION OF LAW ON OCT-24-2019 REACHED THE AGE OF 18 | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | SPECIAL IMMIGRANT JUVENILE FINDINGS (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER GARCIA ABREGO, LUIS GUSTAVO | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF PERSON TERMINATES AT AGE 18 ON OCT 24, 2019, NO BOND REQUIRED ABREGO, CARLOS HUMBERTO APPOINTED | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (14 PAGE, 5 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY MINOR GARCIA ABREGO, LUIS GUSTAVO | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP OF PERSON TERMINATES ON OCT 24, 2019 ISSUED AND FILED ABREGO, CARLOS HUMBERTO APPOINTED | |
October 15, 2019 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR SPECIAL IMMIGRANT JUVENILE FINDINGS
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
October 15, 2019 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF PERSON
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SPECIAL IMMIGRANT JUVENILE FINDINGS, CALENDAR OF OCT-15-2019, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.