Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dolch, Debra J., O'Reilly, Dwight, O'Reilly, Michael, Reilly, Patrick, Remainderpeople, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph M. Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 1989 |
CategoryOther Probate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is in response to a trustee's petition regarding the estate of Francis O'Reilly. The petitioner is requesting permission from the court to use trust funds to purchase a residential property in Southern California. The complaint argues ...
SECOND AMENDED PETN. TO APPOINT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Date: February 15, 2001CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $22,278.93 FILED BY CREDITOR D. CAPPELLETTI & SONS, INC.
Date: November 06, 2001PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: July 19, 2011MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO TRUSTEE'S PETITION FILED BY PETITIONER REMAINDERPEOPLE
Date: November 30, 2011ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND ADVANCING HEARIG DATE ON PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PURCHASE PROPERTY.
Date: November 17, 2011DECLARATION OF ANNE-LEITH MATLOCK FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: November 17, 2011REPLY MOVANT DWIGHT PATRICK REILLY'S REPLY TO REMAINDERPEOPLE'S MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE
Date: December 06, 2011NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: November 17, 2011TWO NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: June 04, 2013CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (SERVED BY MAIL AND FACSIMILE)
Date: July 01, 2011DECLARATION OF ANNE-LEITH MATLOCK FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: November 15, 2011ORDER DENYING TRUSTEE'S PETITION TO ELIMINATE OF SUBSTANTIALLY REDUCE BOND
Date: May 08, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: November 15, 2011NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66846471) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: August 12, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER REMAINDERPEOPLE
Date: November 04, 2011ORDER APPOINTING TRUSTEE / SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J. APPOINTED
Date: November 02, 2021ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS AND TO CONSTRUE TRUST INSTRUMENT
Date: September 30, 2011ORDER DENYING TRUSTEE'S PETITION TO TRANSFER VENUE
Date: May 08, 2013NOTICE OF TRUSTEE/BENEFICIARY'S PURCHASE OF A BOND FILED BY TRUSTEE O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: April 16, 2013ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY & INCREASING BOND
Date: May 24, 2011MEMORANDUM OF REMAINDERPEOPLE'S COUNSEL FILED BY PETITIONER REMAINDERPEOPLE
Date: April 09, 2013NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF BOND PREMIUM
Date: October 15, 2012NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: June 30, 2011NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: February 20, 2013NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PETITIONER REMAINDERPEOPLE
Date: January 11, 2012REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY REQUESTOR H.M. VREELAND & SON INSURANCE AGENCY, INC
Date: October 15, 2012ORDER DENYING TRUSTEE'S PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PURCHASE PROPERTY
Date: January 05, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: August 11, 2011NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY TRUSTEE O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: July 11, 2011DECLARATION OF RICHARD H WISE FILED BY REQUESTOR WISE, RICHARD H.
Date: May 04, 2011REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY REQUESTOR WISE, RICHARD H.
Date: December 11, 2000ORDER ON PETITION FOR ORDER REDUCING TRUSTEES BOND
Date: January 11, 2007NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: December 07, 2006SATISFACTION & RELEASE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM
Date: April 08, 2002TRUSTEE BOND RIDER
Date: April 25, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: April 11, 2011TRUSTEE'S BOND RIDER
Date: March 14, 2007ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER
Date: April 19, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY TRUSTEE O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: December 13, 2006AMENDED PETN. TO APPOINT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Date: January 09, 2001ORDER TO APPOINT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Date: February 28, 2001PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: January 17, 2001ORDER APPOINTING TRUSTEE (TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE) O'REILLY, DWIGHT APPOINTED
Date: January 09, 2001NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: April 05, 2011NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: June 21, 2011WAIVER OF NOTICE FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: May 17, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: February 18, 2005DECLARATION OF R. M. BONNIFIELD FILED BY PETITIONER O'REILLY, DWIGHT
Date: January 04, 2001Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
OFF CALENDAR
Judge: BRANDON SLYKHOUS |
|
December 03, 2021 | Hearing |
ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Bond For Successor Trustee
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS ON FILING BOND FOR SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, CALENDAR OF DEC-03-2021, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | REFUND FROM THE ELIMINATION OF LOCAL SURHARGES (GC 70625) OF $15.00 | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (6 PAGE, 3 CERTIFIED COPY) | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | BOND #39556 IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,425,000.00 FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J. EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE CO. | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING TRUSTEE / SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J. APPOINTED | |
November 01, 2021 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, CALENDAR OF NOV-01-2021, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED. | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS ON FILING BOND FOR SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE HEARING SET FOR DEC-03-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.