Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Glander, John, Schmierer, Caron, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Ross C. Moody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss C. Moody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2023 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This comprehensive legal document includes a complaint filed by the plaintiffs against the defendants, alleging harassment, fraudulent transfer, and financial elder abuse. The plaintiffs seek the dismissal of pending litigation, release of a lis pend...
DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER GLANDER, JOHN
Date: October 25, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 71443689) FILED BY PETITIONER GLANDER, JOHN
Date: November 17, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION (CALIFORNIA NEWSPAPER SERVICE BUREAU) (TRANSACTION ID # 71445220)
Date: November 17, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 71593928) FILED BY PETITIONER SCHMIERER, CARON
Date: December 11, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 71537798) FILED BY PETITIONER SCHMIERER, CARON
Date: December 04, 2023PROBATE WILL DATED OCT-05-2023 ADMITTED TO PROBATE ON JAN-08-2024
Date: January 09, 2024REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 71801168) FILED BY REQUESTOR DOLCH, DEBRA J
Date: January 12, 2024DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 71656536) FILED BY PETITIONER GLANDER, JOHN
Date: December 19, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION (CALIFORNIA NEWSPAPER SERVICE BUREAU) (TRANSACTION ID # 71637794)
Date: December 15, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 71864438) FILED BY PETITIONER SCHMIERER, CARON
Date: January 24, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2025 | Hearing |
ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
April 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Petition For Instructions To Dismiss Portions Of Pending, Estate-Related Litigation
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 71864438) FILED BY PETITIONER SCHMIERER, CARON | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | AMENDED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 71850359) (TRANSACTION ID # 71850359) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SCHMIERER, CARON | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION PART 5 OF 11 EXHS 8-10 (TRANSACTION ID # 71840149) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SCHMIERER, CARON | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PAUL GRUWELL ISO PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 71840149) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SCHMIERER, CARON | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION PART 2 OF 11 (TRANSACTION ID # 71840149) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SCHMIERER, CARON | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS TO DISMISS PORTIONS OF PENDING, ESTATE-RELATED LITIGATION (TRANSACTION ID # 71840149) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SCHMIERER, CARON HEARING SET FOR APR-08-2024 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION PART 8 OF 11 EXH. 12 (TRANSACTION ID # 71840149) (TRANSACTION ID # 71840149) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SCHMIERER, CARON | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 71840149) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SCHMIERER, CARON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.