Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chong, William, Chong, Xue Jun, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Joseph M. Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph M. Quinn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2022 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OBJECTOR CHONG, WILLIAM
Date: June 20, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER CHONG, WILLIAM
Date: April 13, 2022WILL CONTEST (TRANSACTION ID # 67591903) FILED BY OBJECTOR CHONG, ALBERT
Date: May 05, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO OBJECTOR CHONG, ALBERT
Date: May 09, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) (TRANSACTION ID # 67496323)
Date: April 21, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO PETITIONER CHONG, WILLIAM
Date: April 13, 2022WILL CONTEST FILED BY OBJECTOR CHONG, WILLIAM
Date: March 02, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) (TRANSACTION ID # 67334322)
Date: February 22, 2022DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER CHONG, WILLIAM
Date: April 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2022 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED, Appointment Under IAEA
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
July 27, 2022 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL AMENDED AND RESTATEMENT TRUST FO SHIRLEY S.M. CHONG DATED MARCH8, 2021 FILED BY OBJECTOR CHONG, WILLIAM | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 67767587) (TRANSACTION ID # 67767587) FILED BY OBJECTOR CHONG, ALBERT | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 67767587) FILED BY OBJECTOR CHONG, ALBERT | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS (TRANSACTION ID # 67767587) (TRANSACTION ID # 67767587) FILED BY OBJECTOR CHONG, ALBERT | |
June 21, 2022 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
June 21, 2022 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED, Appointment Under IAEA
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA CONTINUED FROM JUN-21-2022 TO JUL-27-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY CONTINUED FROM JUN-21-2022 TO JUL-27-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.