Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gee, Sui Fong, filed a(n) Spousal Property - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Mary E. Wiss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Spousal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeSpousal Property |
ORDER RE: SPOUSAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER GEE, SUI FONG
Date: October 27, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66838281) FILED BY PETITIONER GEE, SUI FONG
Date: August 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (3 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY PETITIONER GEE, SUI FONG | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | REFUND FROM THE ELIMINATION OF LOCAL SURHARGES (GC 70625) OF $15.00 | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: SPOUSAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER GEE, SUI FONG | |
October 26, 2021 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR SPOUSAL PROPERTY
Judge: MARY E. WISS |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SPOUSAL PROPERTY, CALENDAR OF OCT-26-2021, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED. | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL STATEMENTS IN SUPPORT OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION. FILED BY PETITIONER GEE, SUI FONG | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION (TRANSACTION ID # 67007352) FILED BY PETITIONER GEE, SUI FONG | |
September 28, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Continued to 10/26/2021. 1) Please address LRSF 14.26 A. and LRSF 14.26 B. 2) Please file evidence showing the assets are community property. 3) Please file account statements for the alleged assets i...
Judge: BRANDON SLYKHOUS |
|
September 28, 2021 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR SPOUSAL PROPERTY
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SPOUSAL PROPERTY CONTINUED FROM SEP-28-2021 TO OCT-26-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.