Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
O'Flynn, Brian, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph M. Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph M. Quinn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a document related to the duties and liabilities of a personal representative in an estate. The document provides information on the responsibilities of a personal representative, including managing the estate's assets, keeping esta...
DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER O'FLYNN, BRIAN
Date: November 03, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 67839948) FILED BY PETITIONER O'FLYNN, BRIAN
Date: July 20, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 67456996) FILED BY PETITIONER O'FLYNN, BRIAN
Date: April 06, 2022PROBATE WILL DATED MAY-14-2004 AND CODICIL ADMITTED TO PROBATE ON DEC-30-2020
Date: December 30, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL)
Date: November 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE O'FLYNN, BRIAN | |
August 10, 2022 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #1, Report, Fees, Final Distribution
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF AUG-10-2022, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION [ATTORNEY]RE RETENTION OF ORIGINAL BANK STATEMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 67909856) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE O'FLYNN, BRIAN | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY RE: RETENTION OF ORIGINAL BANK STATEMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 67839948) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE O'FLYNN, BRIAN | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 67839948) FILED BY PETITIONER O'FLYNN, BRIAN | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR, PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT, (TRANSACTION ID # 67808406) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE O'FLYNN, BRIAN | |
June 29, 2022 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #1, Report, Fees, Final Distribution
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM JUN-29-2022 TO AUG-10-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY RE RETENTION OF ORIGINAL BANK AND BROKERAGE STATEMENTS AND RE REPORT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 67753654) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE O'FLYNN, BRIAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.