Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hodges, Scott R, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Ross C. Moody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss C. Moody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a document related to the duties and liabilities of a personal representative in an estate case. The document provides information on the responsibilities of a personal representative, including managing the estate's assets, keeping...
DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R
Date: August 06, 2020ORDER APPROVING ACTIONS TAKEN AFTER ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Date: January 11, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 67083841) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R
Date: November 10, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) (TRANSACTION ID # 65867060)
Date: August 21, 2020LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED AND FILED HODGES, SCOTT R APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA
Date: September 23, 2020NOTICE TO CREDITORS (TRANSACTION ID # 66131045) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R
Date: November 20, 2020CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $276.06 FILED BY CREDITOR DISCOVER BANK
Date: December 28, 2020PROBATE WILL DATED FEB-13-2020 ADMITTED TO PROBATE ON SEP-23-2020
Date: September 23, 2020DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R
Date: August 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING ACTIONS TAKEN AFTER ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION | |
January 10, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Grant without hearing. the actions of petitioner, as executor of the estate, taken after the order for final distribution was issued are approved.
Judge: BRANDON SLYKHOUS |
|
January 10, 2022 | Hearing |
Petition For Order Approving Actions Taken After Order For Final Distribution
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING ACTIONS TAKEN AFTER ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF JAN-10-2022, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
December 20, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
OFF CALENDAR
Judge: BRANDON SLYKHOUS |
|
December 20, 2021 | Hearing |
ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of The Estate
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 67083841) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ORDER APPROVING ACTIONS TAKEN AFTER ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 67058675) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R HEARING SET FOR JAN-10-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION BY SCOTT R. HODGES, TRUSTEE OF THE PATRICIA R. ALLEN REVOCABLE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 12, 2020 (TRANSACTION ID # 66914421) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.