Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fisher, Karen L, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph M. Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph M. Quinn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document related to the estate of Husam Mousa Qana, who is the decedent. The document outlines the duties and liabilities of the personal representative appointed by the court to manage the estate. The personal representativ...
DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER FISHER, KAREN L
Date: August 03, 2020CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $1,203.20 FILED BY CREDITOR AMERICN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK
Date: August 19, 2021LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED AND FILED FISHER, KAREN L APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA
Date: September 21, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE BAY AREA REPORTER)
Date: August 27, 2020DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY (TRANSACTION ID # 65905903) FILED BY PETITIONER FISHER, KAREN L
Date: September 04, 2020ORDER AFTER HEARING DENYING MOTION TO SEAL RECORD
Date: March 01, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66333432) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FISHER, KAREN L
Date: February 11, 2021CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $2,316.69 FILED BY CREDITOR CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VENTURE
Date: January 04, 2021CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $5,883.11 FILED BY CREDITOR U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Date: October 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (4 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FISHER, KAREN L | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FISHER, KAREN L | |
August 02, 2022 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #1, Report, Fees, Final Distribution
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF AUG-02-2022, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED. | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | SUPPMENENT TO PETITION TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 67830871) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FISHER, KAREN L | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 67809779) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FISHER, KAREN L | |
July 05, 2022 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #1, Report, Fees, Final Distribution
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM JUL-05-2022 TO AUG-02-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PETITIONER KAREN L. FISHER IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 67770729) FILED BY PETITIONER FISHER, KAREN L | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FINAL $740,556.80 FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FISHER, KAREN L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.