Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Stewart Jr., Norman M., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Joseph M. Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
This complaint document includes several attachments and references to case number PES-20-303558. It appears to be related to a legal case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The document includes a waiver of bond signed by ...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2021 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, CALENDAR OF DEC-01-2021, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT | |
November 10, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Continued to 12/01/2021.
Judge: BRANDON SLYKHOUS |
|
November 10, 2021 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY CONTINUED FROM NOV-10-2021 TO DEC-01-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
October 18, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Continued to 11/10/2021 at request of counsel.
Judge: BRANDON SLYKHOUS |
|
October 18, 2021 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY CONTINUED FROM OCT-18-2021 TO NOV-10-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
September 13, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Continued to 10/18/2021 at request of counsel.
Judge: BRANDON SLYKHOUS |
|
September 13, 2021 | Hearing |
PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Judge: VEDICA PURI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.