Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Danhi, Solomon Adam, filed a(n) Petition To Establish Fact Of Death case against Danhi, Louis Adam, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Kennedy Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2019 |
CategoryPetition To Establish Fact Of Death |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time77 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2019 | Hearing |
PETITION TO ESTABLISH FACT OF DEATH
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION TO ESTABLISH FACT OF DEATH, CALENDAR OF OCT-28-2019, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT | |
September 23, 2019 | Hearing |
PETITION TO ESTABLISH FACT OF DEATH
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION TO ESTABLISH FACT OF DEATH CONTINUED FROM SEP-23-2019 TO OCT-28-2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
September 09, 2019 | Hearing |
PETITION TO ESTABLISH FACT OF DEATH
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION TO ESTABLISH FACT OF DEATH CONTINUED FROM SEP-09-2019 TO SEP-23-2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
August 19, 2019 | Hearing |
PETITION TO ESTABLISH FACT OF DEATH
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION TO ESTABLISH FACT OF DEATH CONTINUED FROM AUG-19-2019 TO SEP-09-2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO ESTABLISH FACT, TIME AND PLACE OF DEATH FILED BY PETITIONER DANHI, SOLOMON ADAM | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION TO ESTABLISH FACT OF DEATH FILED BY PETITIONER DANHI, SOLOMON ADAM AS TO RESPONDENT DANHI, LOUIS ADAM HEARING SET FOR AUG-19-2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.