Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Soliai, Cecile, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Corman, Lisa A, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Mary E. Wiss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint document is titled "Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative" and is related to the estate of Gaualofa M. Casey. The document provides instructions and information for the personal representative of the estate. It states that ...
DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER SOLIAI, CECILE
Date: March 25, 2019ORDER AUTHORIZING WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS FROM BLOCKED ACCOUNT
Date: October 29, 2021ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PETITIONER SOLIAI, CECILE
Date: August 03, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66299694) FILED BY PETITIONER SOLIAI, CECILE
Date: February 01, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66718650) FILED BY PETITIONER SOLIAI, CECILE
Date: June 25, 2021ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER SOLIAI, CECILE
Date: December 02, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66100250) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SOLIAI, CECILE
Date: November 12, 2020ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT
Date: December 04, 2020NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 65989118) FILED BY PETITIONER SOLIAI, CECILE
Date: October 05, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) (TRANSACTION ID # 65949599)
Date: September 21, 2020NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 65900475) FILED BY ASSIGNEE PROBATE ADVANCE, LLC
Date: September 02, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66661453) FILED BY PETITIONER SOLIAI, CECILE
Date: June 07, 2021NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64542310) FILED BY ASSIGNEE PROBATE ADVANCE, LLC
Date: December 18, 2019NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64608839) FILED BY ASSIGNEE PROBATE ADVANCE, LLC
Date: January 10, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66510753) FILED BY PETITIONER SOLIAI, CECILE
Date: April 14, 2021NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64459697) FILED BY ASSIGNEE PROBATE ADVANCE, LLC
Date: November 22, 2019NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64730708) FILED BY ASSIGNEE PROBATE ADVANCE, LLC
Date: February 14, 2020NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64303911) FILED BY ASSIGNEE PROBATE ADVANCE, LLC
Date: October 10, 2019NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64110161) FILED BY ASSIGNEE PROBATE ADVANCE, LLC
Date: August 19, 2019NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64148684) FILED BY ASSIGNEE PROBATE ADVANCE, LLC
Date: August 30, 2019NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64472691) FILED BY ASSIGNEE PROBATE ADVANCE, LLC
Date: November 27, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL)
Date: April 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF ASSIGNMENT(S) (TRANSACTION ID # 67134147) FILED BY ASSIGNEE INHERITANCE FUNDING COMPANY, INC. | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67134147) FILED BY REQUESTOR INHERITANCE FUNDING COMPANY, INC. | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (27 PAGE, 6 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SOLIAI, CECILE | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTHORIZING WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS FROM BLOCKED ACCOUNT | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FEES ***AMENDED*** FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SOLIAI, CECILE | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF LISA A CORMAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CORRECT ORDER FILED AUGUST 3, 2021 AND TO RELEASE FUNDS FROM BLOCKED ACCOUNTS (TRANSACTION ID # 66974056) FILED BY PETITIONER SOLIAI, CECILE | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | 2ND AMENDED PETITION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS FROM BLOCKED ACCOUNT (TRANSACTION ID # 66973114) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SOLIAI, CECILE | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS FROM BLOCKED ACCOUNT EX PARTE (TRANSACTION ID # 66923854) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SOLIAI, CECILE | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES TO CORRECT ORDER ISSUED AUG 3, 2021 (TRANSACTION ID # 66923854) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SOLIAI, CECILE | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF LISA A CORMAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CORRECT THE ORDER ISSUED AUG 3, 2021 (TRANSACTION ID # 66873964) FILED BY PETITIONER SOLIAI, CECILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.