Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rehmet, Rachel, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph M. Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph M. Quinn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 08, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint was electronically filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco on January 10, 2020. The clerk of the court, Aisha Nelson, processed the filing.
Unfortunately, the provided text does not contain any dollar amoun...
PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL)
Date: August 28, 2018ORDER / EX PARTE ORDER FOR REDUCTION IN BOND
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 64542229) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE REHMET, RACHEL
Date: December 18, 2019DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER REHMET, RACHEL
Date: August 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE REHMET, RACHEL | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER / EX PARTE ORDER FOR REDUCTION IN BOND | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MARGARET M. ODOWD IN RESPONSE TO EXAMINERS NOTES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE PETITION FOR REDUCTION IN BOND (TRANSACTION ID # 66693609) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE REHMET, RACHEL | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MARGARET M ODOWD REGARDING THE RETENTION OF ORIGINAL BANK STATEMENTS IN SUPPPORT OF THE EX PARTE PETITION FOR REDUCTION IN BOND (TRANSACTION ID # 66627169) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE REHMET, RACHEL | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST REPUBLIC BANK STATEMENTS AS OF JANUARY 31 2021 CHECKING ACOUNT NO XXXX 1 9480 AND MONEY MARKET SAVINGS ACCOUNT XXXX6 2376 (TRANSACTION ID # 66627169) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE REHMET, RACHEL | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (15) (TRANSACTION ID # 66627169) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE REHMET, RACHEL | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | PROBATE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR REDUCTION IN BOND (TRANSACTION ID # 66627169) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE REHMET, RACHEL | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66627169) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE REHMET, RACHEL | |
August 18, 2020 | Hearing |
ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Certified Copy Of Letters Issued To The Personal Representative
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS ON FILING CERTIFIED COPY OF LETTERS ISSUED TO THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, CALENDAR OF AUG-18-2020, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.