Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Huey, Cindy, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Peter J. Busch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2015 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time485 days |
This complaint is a document related to a probate case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The document is a waiver of bond by an heir or beneficiary named Cindy Huey in the estate of Lui Ol Kwan. The waiver states that the ...
ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION REPORT
Date: January 21, 2016NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, CINDY
Date: April 02, 2015DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, CINDY
Date: March 04, 2015EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, CINDY
Date: July 01, 2016NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, CINDY
Date: March 13, 2015DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, CINDY
Date: March 04, 2015NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, CINDY
Date: April 21, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 58230958) FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, CINDY
Date: December 01, 2015PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)
Date: March 23, 2015FIVE WAIVERS OF BOND FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, CINDY
Date: April 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, CINDY | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 59180077) FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, CINDY | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION REPORT | |
January 20, 2016 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF JAN-20-2016, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
December 30, 2015 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM DEC-30-2015 TO JAN-20-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 58230958) FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, CINDY | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FINAL, $346,000.00 FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HUEY, CINDY | |
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FINAL DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58218538) FILED BY PETITIONER HUEY, CINDY HEARING SET FOR DEC-30-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.