Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
THE ESTATE OF THOMAS PATRICK BRIDENSTINE
On December 06, 2012 a petition for letters of administration case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Andrew Y.S. Cheng presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 06, 2012
Last Refreshed
November 23, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Estate Administration
Case Duration
2 years, 7 months and 28 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
PETITION FOR
ber 8, 2014 (continued)
, Room 204
ENSTINE,
ENSTINE,
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a second declaration by Don Bridenstine and Ann Zann, co-administrators of the estate of Thomas Patrick Bridenstine, in response to the examiner's notes regarding a petition for final distribution. The declaration addresses the …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FEES
Date: Jan 06, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN
Date: Jul 10, 2014WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN
Date: Jun 27, 2014NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY GABE, MELISSA A.
Date: Jul 10, 2013NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN
Date: Jun 11, 2013NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN
Date: May 28, 2013CREDITORS CLAIM FOR 6,367.22 FILED BY CREDITOR BANK OF AMERICA
Date: May 06, 2013DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN
Date: Jan 22, 2013PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE S.F. DAILY JOURNAL)
Date: Jan 15, 2013DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN
Date: Dec 06, 2012Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PURSUANT CALIFORNIA PROBATE CODE 13100 FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ZANN, ANN | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF J.P. AVERY REGARDING RECEIPT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTIONFOR W. BRIDENSTINE. FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF CASH RESERVE BY LOUIS BRIDENSTINE, JR. FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF CASH RESERVE BY DON BRIDENSTINE FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF CASH RESERVE BY JAMES BRIDENSTINE FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF CASH RESERVE BY ANN ZANN FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF CASH RESERVE BY WILLIAM BRIDENSTINE FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CON-ADMINISTRATORS ACCOUNTING FOR DISPOSITION OF CASH RESERVE FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (FIVE RECEIPTS) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ZANN, ANN | |
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FEES | |
January 05, 2015 | hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF JAN-05-2015, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF JAN-05-2015, TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF JAN-05-2015 [WITHOUT HEARING] | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECL. OF CO-ADMINISTRATORS FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION [SUPPLEMENTAL] OF CO-ADMINISTRATORS DON BRIDENSTINE AND ANN ZANN VERIFYING DECLARATIONS OF ATTORNEY MELISSA A. GABE FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
December 22, 2014 | hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM DEC-22-2014 TO JAN-05-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
December 08, 2014 | hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM DEC-08-2014 TO DEC-22-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION SECOND DECLARATION OF DON BRIDENSTIN AND ANN ZANN, CO-ADMINISTRATORS, IN RESPONSE TO EXAMINER'S NOTES RE PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DON BRIDENSTINE AND ANN ZANN, CO-ADMINISTRATORS, IN RESPONSE TO EXAMINER NOTES RE PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION. FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event | APPROVAL/REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN $6,367.22 REJECTED, ON CLAIM OF CREDITOR BANK OF AMERICA | |
August 25, 2014 | hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM AUG-25-2014 TO DEC-08-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF M.A. GABE CORRECTING CLERICAL ERROR IN PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND FOR ITS SETTLEMENT; FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MELISSA A. GABEIN RESPONSE TO EXAMINER NOTE'S RE PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION. FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
August 11, 2014 | hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: JOHN DEARMAN |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM AUG-11-2014 TO AUG-25-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN HEARING SET FOR AUG-11-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MELISSAW A. GABE FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING [4] FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL SUPPLEMENTAL, $21,221.96 FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIM FOR PERSONAL INCOME TAX FILED BY CREDITOR STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY REQUESTOR STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD | |
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event | CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $4,296.80 FILED BY CREDITOR STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FINAL, $34,890.50 FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF INVENTORY & APPRAISAL FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL PARTIAL #1, PROPERTY TAX CERTIFICATION, $929,500.00 FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY GABE, MELISSA A. | |
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event | CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $6,367.22 FILED BY CREDITOR BANK OF AMERICA | |
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $30,739.52 FILED BY CREDITOR STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD | |
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY REQUESTOR STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD | |
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED AND FILED ZANN, ANN APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA | |
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (1 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | BOND #070015391 IN THE AMOUNT OF $131,000.00 FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY LIBERTY MUTUAL | |
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/ADMINISTRATRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, $131,000.00 BOND REQUIRED BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN APPOINTED | |
February 06, 2013 | hearing |
PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Judge: MARY E. WISS |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, CALENDAR OF FEB-06-2013, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER, BOND IN THE AMOUNT OF $131,000.00 REQUIRED | |
January 23, 2013 | hearing |
PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Judge: MARY E. WISS |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION CONTINUED FROM JAN-23-2013 TO FEB-06-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE S.F. DAILY JOURNAL) | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
January 02, 2013 | hearing |
PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION CONTINUED FROM JAN-02-2013 TO JAN-23-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (AMY HARRINGTON) FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN AS TO DECEDENT BRIDENSTINE, THOMAS PATRICK AKA T. PATRICK BRIDENSTINE HEARING SET FOR JAN-02-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 | |
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event | DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN | |
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER BRIDENSTINE, DON ZANN, ANN |