Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lombardo, Richard J., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Mary E. Wiss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 14, 2008 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time663 days |
This complaint is a supplement to the first and final report of the personal representative and petition for settlement in the case of the estate of Lynda Jean Lombardo. The petitioner, Richard J. Lombardo, as the administrator of the estate, states ...
DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECL. OF PETITIONER FILED BY PETITIONER LOMBARDO, RICHARD J.
Date: September 17, 2008NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER LOMBARDO, RICHARD J.
Date: August 14, 2008PARTIAL DISCLAIMER FILED BY PETITIONER LOMBARDO, RICHARD J.
Date: August 14, 2008SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION
Date: September 10, 2008ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION REPORT, FEES (ACCOUNTING WAIVED)
Date: October 27, 2009WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING ,TWO WIAVERS FILED BY PETITIONER LOMBARDO, RICHARD J.
Date: August 14, 2008NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER LOMBARDO, RICHARD J.
Date: March 18, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LOMBARDO, RICHARD J.
Date: March 23, 2010NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE LOMBARDO, RICHARD J.
Date: July 16, 2009RECEIPT [2] FILED BY PETITIONER LOMBARDO, RICHARD J.
Date: March 18, 2010NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE LOMBARDO, RICHARD J.
Date: September 25, 2009PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LOMBARDO, RICHARD J.
Date: August 25, 2008PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)
Date: August 29, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LOMBARDO, RICHARD J.
Date: July 22, 2009NOMINATION
Date: September 10, 2008ACCUNT BALANCE LETTER FROM FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE LOMBARDO, RICHARD J.
Date: September 25, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE LOMBARDO, RICHARD J. | |
May 17, 2010 | Hearing |
Petition For Discharge Of Personal Representative
Judge: MARY E. WISS |
|
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, CALENDAR OF MAY-17-2010, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT | |
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LOMBARDO, RICHARD J. | |
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER LOMBARDO, RICHARD J. | |
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIPT [2] FILED BY PETITIONER LOMBARDO, RICHARD J. | |
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE LOMBARDO, RICHARD J. HEARING SET FOR MAY-17-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 | |
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION REPORT, FEES (ACCOUNTING WAIVED) | |
October 26, 2009 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: SUE M. KAPLAN |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF OCT-26-2009, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.