Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Devries, Barbara, Lehnherr, Wayne, Lehnherr, William A, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case against Does 1-10, Follard, Linda M, Lehnherr, Wayne, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with John Dearman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Dearman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2006 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1007 days |
This complaint document is titled "Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative" and is related to the estate of Velma V. Lehnherr. The document provides instructions and information for the personal representative of the estate. It outlines the...
NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WAYNE
Date: November 30, 2006FINANCIAL INSTITUTION STATEMENTS
Date: August 25, 2008RECEIPT ON FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DEVRIES, BARBARA
Date: June 10, 2009RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DEVRIES, BARBARA
Date: November 20, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DEVRIES, BARBARA
Date: August 26, 2008RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DEVRIES, BARBARA
Date: November 17, 2008NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER DEVRIES, BARBARA
Date: August 25, 2008WILL ADMITTED TO PROBATE
Date: August 11, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WAYNE
Date: August 08, 2008NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WAYNE
Date: June 30, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WAYNE
Date: July 01, 2008MINUTES FOR MAY 14, 2008 AT 3:30 PM FOR DEPT 611
Date: May 14, 2008NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT
Date: December 18, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DEVRIES, BARBARA
Date: May 15, 2007ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Date: October 28, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WAYNE
Date: February 14, 2007WILL CONTEST FILED BY OBJECTOR LEHNHERR, WILLIAM A
Date: January 26, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WILLIAM A
Date: October 25, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WAYNE
Date: December 21, 2006PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO CHRONICLE)
Date: October 25, 2006NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WAYNE
Date: November 30, 2006PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)
Date: December 12, 2006STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT OF WILLIAM LEHNHERR FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WILLIAM A
Date: December 13, 2007NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WILLIAM A
Date: October 06, 2006DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WAYNE
Date: December 06, 2006DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WILLIAM A
Date: October 25, 2006CORRECTED SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION BY PETITIONER CORRECTED PETN. FOR PROBATE
Date: February 15, 2007CSE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER LEHNHERR, WAYNE
Date: November 28, 2007MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE TO PRO BONO MEDIATION
Date: January 31, 2007CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: December 10, 2007CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (UNLIMITED CASE)
Date: November 21, 2007ORDER MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE TO TRIAL IN THE DEPARTMENT OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE
Date: December 18, 2007ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION & SETTLEMENT OF WILL CONTEST
Date: August 11, 2008DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER DEVRIES, BARBARA
Date: August 12, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2009 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DEVRIES, BARBARA | |
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DEVRIES, BARBARA | |
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DEVRIES, BARBARA | |
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DEVRIES, BARBARA | |
October 28, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES | |
October 28, 2008 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: JOHN DEARMAN |
|
October 28, 2008 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES | |
October 28, 2008 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF OCT-28-2008, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT TO THE FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED AND PETITION ITS APPROVAL; FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DEVRIES, BARBARA | |
September 22, 2008 | Hearing |
ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status For The Filing Of The Petition For Final Distribution By The Administrator With Will Annexed.
Judge: SUE M. KAPLAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.