Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mead, Rebecca J., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Sue M. Kaplan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSue M. Kaplan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2006 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1182 days |
NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: January 26, 2006RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: May 30, 2008RECEIPT FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: August 26, 2008RECEIPT FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: May 14, 2008GRADUATED FILING FEE ADJUSTMENTS
Date: April 03, 2008NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: April 03, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: April 04, 2008RELEASE OF CLAIM OF HOUSEHOLD RECOVERY SERVICES FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: April 25, 2007CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $7,712.25 FILED BY CREDITOR HOUSEHOLD RECOVERY SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2006CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $37,094.07 FILED BY CREDITOR CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA
Date: June 01, 2006NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: October 27, 2006CREDITOR'S CLAIM FILED BY CREDITOR MBNA AMERICA
Date: March 21, 2006WILL ADMITTED MARCH 28, 2006
Date: March 28, 2006PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE S.F. DAILY JOURNAL)
Date: February 22, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: February 08, 2006CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $19,359.49 FILED BY CREDITOR CAPITAL ONE
Date: March 02, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: March 09, 2006DECLARATION OF REBECCA J. MEAD FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: March 03, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: February 03, 2006PROBATE CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: January 26, 2006RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (FOUR RECEIPTS) FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: August 13, 2008RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (TWO RECEIPTS) FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: April 14, 2009SATISFACTION & AND RELEASE OF MBNA AMERICA
Date: January 18, 2007DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: January 26, 2006REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY REQUESTOR MEAD, VICTORIA
Date: November 17, 2006RELEASE OF CLAIM OF CAPITAL ONE FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: February 27, 2007DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: June 20, 2007REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY REQUESTOR MEAD, VICTORIA
Date: January 10, 2007ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (KIMIKO BURTON) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: February 23, 2007DISCLAIMER FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: May 23, 2008DECLARATION OF REBECCA J. MEAD FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J.
Date: April 14, 2009ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Date: July 01, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE MEAD, REBECCA J. | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (TWO RECEIPTS) FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J. | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF REBECCA J. MEAD FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J. | |
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE MEAD, REBECCA J. | |
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (FOUR RECEIPTS) FILED BY PETITIONER MEAD, REBECCA J. | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION | |
June 30, 2008 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: SUE M. KAPLAN |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF JUN-30-2008, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event | SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST, FINAL ACCOUNT & REPT. OF EXECUTOR, PETN. FOR ITS SETTL., ALLOW. OFC OMP. & FINAL DISTRIB. | |
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR ANTICIPATORY DISTRIBUTION AND INDEMNITY AGREEMENT FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE MEAD, REBECCA J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.