Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Arita, Carlos M., Arita, Carmen, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with John Dearman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2005 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time335 days |
This complaint document is titled "Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative" and is related to the estate of George Albert Arita Umana. It provides information and instructions to the personal representative of the estate regarding their res...
DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER ARITA, CARMEN
Date: November 14, 2005ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (SHIRLEY C. YAWITZ) FILED BY PETITIONER ARITA, CARMEN ARITA, CARLOS M.
Date: December 09, 2005WAIVER OF EXECUTOR COMMISSION
Date: July 07, 2006ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: August 08, 2006WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED BY PETITIONER ARITA, CARMEN
Date: July 07, 2006PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)
Date: November 02, 2005WILL ADMITTED NOVEMBER 14, 2005
Date: November 14, 2005WAIVER OF BOND FILED BY PETITIONER ARITA, CARMEN
Date: October 04, 2005PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)
Date: October 17, 2005WAIVER OF NECESSITY OF BOND
Date: October 14, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER ARITA, CARMEN
Date: October 11, 2005PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)
Date: October 04, 2005PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS (4) FILED BY PETITIONER ARITA, CARMEN ARITA, CARLOS M.
Date: September 23, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2006 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES | |
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
August 08, 2006 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: JOHN DEARMAN |
|
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF AUG-08-2006, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event | CORRECTED INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FINAL, CORRECTED, $1,348,516.49 FILED BY PETITIONER ARITA, CARMEN | |
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION AND FINAL APPRAISED ESTATE VALUE DIFFERENCE FILED BY PETITIONER ARITA, CARMEN | |
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER ARITA, CARMEN HEARING SET FOR AUG-08-2006 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 | |
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF EXECUTOR COMMISSION | |
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF PETN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION, FOR FEES FILED BY PETITIONER ARITA, CARMEN | |
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED BY PETITIONER ARITA, CARMEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.