Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fabbri, Raymond, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with John Dearman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2005 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time293 days |
This complaint document is titled "Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative" and is related to the estate of Anna M. Fabbri. It provides information about the responsibilities and obligations of a personal representative appointed by the cou...
DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND
Date: May 11, 2005NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND
Date: May 11, 2005WILL ADMITTED JUNE 7, 2005 FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND
Date: June 07, 2005PROBATE CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND
Date: January 19, 2006PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)
Date: May 19, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND
Date: May 25, 2005ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT
Date: February 28, 2006WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND
Date: February 06, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND
Date: February 08, 2006WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND
Date: January 19, 2006NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND
Date: January 19, 2006WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETN. FOR FINAL DISTRIB.
Date: February 23, 2006ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (KIMIKO BURTON) FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND
Date: June 21, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT | |
February 28, 2006 | Hearing |
Rept. Of Admin., Petn. For Agreed Comp. And For Final Distrib. On Waiver Of Account
Judge: JOHN DEARMAN |
|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event | REPT. OF ADMIN., PETN. FOR AGREED COMP. AND FOR FINAL DISTRIB. ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT, CALENDAR OF FEB-28-2006, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES | |
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETN. FOR FINAL DISTRIB. | |
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND | |
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event | PROBATE CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND | |
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION AND FINAL APPRAISED ESTATE VALUE DIFFERENCE FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FABBRI, RAYMOND | |
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event | REPT. OF ADMIN., PETN. FOR AGREED COMP. AND FOR FINAL DISTRIB. ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED BY PETITIONER FABBRI, RAYMOND HEARING SET FOR FEB-28-2006 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.