Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Perry, Diane, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case against Rivas, James, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Sue M. Kaplan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2010 |
CategoryElder And Adult Dependent Abuse |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Case Cycle Time33 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2010 | Hearing |
NOTICE OF HEARING AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE)
Judge: SUE M. KAPLAN |
|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR JUN-30-2010 11:00 AM FOR DEPT 204 | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE) (CLETS) FILED BY PERSON TO BE PROTECTED PERRY, DIANE AS TO PERSON TO BE RESTRAINED RIVAS, JAMES | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO USE JUDGE PRO TEM AND ORDER ; STIPULATION SIGNED BY JENNIFER PERRY (POWER OF ATTORNEY) FOR DIANE PERRY FILED BY PERRY, DIANE RIVAS, JAMES | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE), CALENDAR OF JUN-30-2010, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER PERRY, DIANE | |
June 17, 2010 | Hearing | NOTICE OF HEARING AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE) | |
June 17, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE) CONTINUED FROM JUN-17-2010 TO JUN-30-2010 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER PETITIONER PER COURT | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | REISSUE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (ELDER ABUSE) FILED BY PERSON TO BE PROTECTED PERRY, DIANE AS TO PERSON TO BE RESTRAINED RIVAS, JAMES | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER PERRY, DIANE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.