Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Omar, Siti, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Ross C. Moody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss C. Moody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Appointment Of Conservator Of Person |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Hearing |
FILING OF STATUS REPORT
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | FILING OF STATUS REPORT, CALENDAR OF JUN-13-2022, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | STATUS REPORT (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY CONSERVATOR OMAR, SITI | |
July 19, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
OFF CALENDAR
Judge: HELEN TROWBRIDGE |
|
July 19, 2021 | Hearing |
ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Compliance Status Hearing
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR COMPLIANCE STATUS HEARING, CALENDAR OF JUL-19-2021, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | GENERAL PLAN (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY CONSERVATOR OMAR, SITI | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DETERMINATION OF CONSERVATEE'S APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FILED BY PETITIONER OMAR, SITI | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (6 PAGE, 2 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY CONSERVATOR OMAR, SITI | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF LIMITED CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON ISSUED AND FILED OMAR, SITI APPOINTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.