Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The May Company Department Stores, Finn Valarie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cohen Bob M. & Associates, against Cranshaw Mike C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts San Fernando Courthouse with WILLIAM MACLAUGHLIN presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 07, 2000 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Fernando Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time403 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
January 18, 2002 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
January 14, 2002 | Docket Event |
in Department D, WILLIAM MACLAUGHLIN, Presiding Order to Show Cause (re dismissal) - Off Calendar - Dismissal Filed Judge: WILLIAM MACLAUGHLIN |
|
January 14, 2002 | Hearing |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (per 225 CRC as to any remaining parties ) Filed by Court |
|
January 08, 2002 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION ONLY ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
January 08, 2002 | Docket Event |
in Department D1135, CLERK, Presiding Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICEAS TO COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTIONONLY) - ENTERED Judge: CLERK |
|
December 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department D, WILLIAM MACLAUGHLIN, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE: DISMISSAL) - Matter is continued Judge: WILLIAM MACLAUGHLIN |
|
November 30, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department D1135, CLERK, Presiding Request for Dismissal (COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILEDON 2/15/01 MUST BE DISMISS BEFOREENTIRE ACTION CAN BE DISMISS) - REJECTED Judge: CLERK |
|
November 13, 2001 | Hearing |
Notice (OF SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
November 08, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department D, William MacLaughlin, Presiding Motion (FOR RELIEF UNDER CCP 473 TO VACATEDISMISSAL) - Motion Granted Judge: William MacLaughlin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.