Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of El Dorado County. This case was filed in El Dorado County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationEl Dorado County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion for Leave to File 1st Amended Complaint. The initial complaint in this action was filed on February 9, 2017. On January 18, 2018 the court granted defendant’s motion for leave to file a 1st ame...
Judge: Warren C. Stracener |
|
April 06, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendant’s Motion for Summary Judgment. TENTATIVE RULING # 3: THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED TO 10:00 A.M. ON FRIDAY, JUNE 1, 2018 IN DEPARTMENT NINE.
Judge: Warren C. Stracener |
|
February 02, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendant’s Motion for Summary Judgment TENTATIVE RULING # 2: THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED TO 10:00 A.M. ON FRIDAY, APRIL 6, 2018 IN DEPARTMENT NINE.
Judge: Warren C. Stracener |
|
January 18, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendant’s Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. On February 9, 2017 plaintiff filed a complaint against defendant asserting causes of action for negligence, property damage, and trespass to timbe...
Judge: Warren C. Stracener |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.