Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of El Dorado County. This case was filed in El Dorado County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationEl Dorado County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Bass Underwriters, Inc.’s Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. Cross-Defendant Bass Underwriters, Inc. (Bass) has agreed to pay $1,300,000 to defendant General Star Indemnity Co. (Genera...
Judge: Warren C. Stracener |
|
May 17, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Bass Underwriters, Inc.’s Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. TENTATIVE RULING # 5: THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED TO 8:30 A.M. ON THURSDAY, JUNE 21, 2018 IN DEPARTMENT NINE.
Judge: Warren C. Stracener |
|
February 01, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendant/Cross-Defendant Deatsch Ins. Agency, Inc.’s Motion to Compel Cross- Defendant Bass Underwriters, Inc. to Produce a Person Qualified for Deposition. Defendant/Cross-Complainant Deatsch Ins. A...
Judge: Warren C. Stracener |
|
November 16, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendant Bass Underwriters, Inc.’s Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. TENTATIVE RULING # 3: THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED TO 8:30 A.M. ON THURSDAY, JANUARY 11, 2018 IN DEPARTMENT NINE.
Judge: Warren C. Stracener |
|
November 09, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendant Deatsch Ins. Agency, Inc.’s Motion to Compel Amended Responses to Requests for Production and Inspection. TENTATIVE RULING # 6: THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED TO 8:30 A.M. ON THURSDAY, DECEMBER 14...
Judge: Warren C. Stracener |
|
October 19, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Bass Underwriters, Inc.’s Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. TENTATIVE RULING # 6: THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED TO 8:30 A.M. ON THURSDAY, NOVEMBER 16, 2017 IN DEPARTMENT NINE.
Judge: Warren C. Stracener |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.