Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kenney John F., Call Merlin W, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Bunn David Granger, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Clifford L. Klein presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 1954 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Authority Hearing (Non-Trust) |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Successor Trustee |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Objection - Trust Petition (Objection - Trust Petition ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
LACourtConnect-Fees Paid V Filed by Successor Trustee |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Successor Trustee |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Priver, Mark S., Presiding Authority Hearing (Non-Trust) - Held - Continued Judge: Mark S. |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 24, 2021 | Hearing | ||
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Successor Trustee |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.