Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Newell, Kimberli, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Blake, Emily, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Susanne M. Fenstermacher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2023 |
CategoryTrust-Efile |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 | Order Filed Re: | ||
October 03, 2023 |
Hearing in Re:
Judge: Fenstermacher, Susanne M |
||
October 03, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | P23-00879 MATTER OF: THE KIMBERLI DENISE NEWELL REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST 9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM TRUST ASSETS FILED ON 05/10/23 BY KIMBERLI NEWELL Need: 1. Appearances 2. Proposed Ord... | |
September 20, 2023 | Lodge Order/Judgment | ||
July 18, 2023 | Notice of Hearing Re: | ||
June 14, 2023 | Declaration of | ||
May 10, 2023 | Probate Trust Petition Filed | ||
May 10, 2023 | Assigned Probate Referee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.