Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Reed, Geoffrey A., filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by Rousseau, Srinoi G, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with John William Kennedy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | P22-01438 ESTATE OF: JEANNE REED 9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: FIRST AND FINAL REPORT WITH WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT, ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION FOR ORDINARY SERVICES, AND FINAL DISTRIB... | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Will Admited , and Testament, w/First Codicil dated 11/19/2003 |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Executor Filed | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition in Re: For probate of will & for letters testamentary with IAEA filed on 08/29/22 by Geoffrey A. Reed Judge: George, Virginia M |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Surety Bond Posted From: HARCO INSURANCE $20,000.00 |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letters Issued TESTAMENTARY |
|
December 15, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | P22-01438 ESTATE OF: JEANNE REED 9:00 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: FOR PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY WITH IAEA FILED ON 08/29/22 BY GEOFFREY A. REED Need: Verified declaration by petitio... | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Geffrey A. Reed in Response to Examiner's Notes |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Codicil Filed FIRST CODICIL TO THE WILL OF JEANNE K REED EXEC ON 11-17-2006 Judge: Brian F. Haynes |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Will Lodged No Fee EXEC ON 11/19/2003 Judge: Brian F. Haynes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.