Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Le, Ha Manh, filed a(n) case represented by Vo, Matthew Triet, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with John William Kennedy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Confirming trust assets |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notes Signed Order sent to Clerk's Office |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition in Re: PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS FILED ON 8/29/22 BY HA MANH LE Judge: Fenstermacher, Susanne M |
|
January 17, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | P22-01431 MATTER OF: THE KEN TU LIVING TRUST, DATED MAY 19, 2019 9:00 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS FILED ON 8/29/22 BY HA MANH LE Petition Approved Proposed... | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition in Re: Petition for Order confirming Trust assets filed on 8/29/22 by Ha Manh Le Judge: Schmuck, Mark |
|
December 27, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | P22-01431 MATTER OF: THE KEN TU LIVING TRUST, DATED MAY 19, 2019 9:00 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS FILED ON 8/29/22 BY HA MANH LE Need: 1. Proof of mailing ... | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Lodge Order/Judgment Proposed Order Confirming Trust Assets |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Re: Petition to Determine Claim to Property |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Assigned Probate Referee Lee Kaster |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Trust Petition Filed Petition for Order confirming trust assets |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.