Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Keller, Daniel, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by Johnson, Elizabeth C A, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with John William Kennedy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Creditor's Claim Filed | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Creditor's Claim Filed | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice to Creditors Filed | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letters Issued of administration |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Authorizing Independant Administration of Estate-With Full Authority-No bond required Order Expires: 2 Filed |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notes Signed Order in D15 for pick up and filing by the petitioner |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition in Re: Letters of Administration w/IAEA Filed on 08/11/22 by Daniel Keller Judge: Fenstermacher, Susanne M |
|
December 06, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | P22-01301 ESTATE OF: JEFFREY KELLER 9:00 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/IAEA FILED ON 08/11/22 BY DANIEL KELLER Need: Proposed Order SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COS... | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Lodge Order/Judgment Proposed Order for Probate |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Re: Notice of Peittion to Administer Estate: 10/12/22, 10/14/22, 10/21/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.