Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Borden, Shelley E, Borden, Gary B, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with F. Dino Inumerable presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeF. Dino Inumerable Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management104 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryProbate |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions797 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney (Former Attorney is Thomas E Olson, New Attorney W. Todd Stevenson) filed by BORDEN, GARY B on 03/22/2016. | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney (Former Attorney is Thomas E Olson, Esq, New Attorney is Robert Baskin) filed by BORDEN, SHELLEY E on 02/23/2016. | |
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Order - Other (On Petition of Betty Garrity for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs and Co-Trustee Shelley Borden's Motion to Tax Costs) filed by BORDEN, SHELLEY E; BORDEN, GARY B on 05/21/2013. | |
May 16, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
Causal Document & Date Filed : Petition (Subsequent), 03/18/2013 The parties' Sept. 2011 settlement agreement, entered into by the three siblings as "individuals" and as co-trustees, provides that the...
Judge: Glen M. Reiser |
|
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/16/2013 09:00:00 AM. | |
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Probate Notes for Petition for Fees set on 05/16/2013 09:00:00 AM published. | |
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Supplement - Other (To Opposition to Petition of Betty Garrity for Award of Attorney Fees and costs) filed by BORDEN, GARY B; BORDEN, SHELLEY E on 05/15/2013. | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of Continuance of Hearing) filed by BORDEN, GARY B; BORDEN, SHELLEY E on 04/24/2013. | |
April 18, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
Causal Document & Date Filed : Petition (Subsequent), 03/18/2013 Per ¶ 6(c) of the 9/26/11 settlement agreement, the court grants Mr. Lawton's fee petition. The attorney fee award is $2360, the court ...
Judge: Glen M. Reiser |
|
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Continued on Court's own motion. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.