Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shull, Joseph, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2005 |
CategoryProbate Of Will - Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time2299 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to J6 effective 04/13/2012. | |
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event | 09/21/2006: Order/Judgment on Final Distribution (Probate) filed. | |
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event | 09/21/2006: FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT, FEES AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION Hearing: APPROVED | |
September 18, 2006 | Docket Event | 09/18/2006: 1ST Supplement to 1ST & FINAL ACCT & REPT, FEES & FINAL DISTRIBUTION filed by JOSEPH SHULL | |
September 07, 2006 | Docket Event | 09/07/2006: FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT, FEES AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION Hearing: CONTINUED NOT HEARD | |
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event | 09/05/2006: Notice of Hearing re FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT filed | |
September 01, 2006 | Docket Event | 09/01/2006: Notice of Hearing re FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT filed | |
September 01, 2006 | Docket Event | 09/01/2006: GRADUATED FILING FEES filed by JOSEPH SHULL | |
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event | 08/09/2006: FIRST and Final Accounting and Report, Fees and Final Distribution filed | |
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event | 08/09/2006: DECEDENT Inventory and Appraisement filed; 2 attachments |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.