Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Magallanes, Albert R, filed a(n) Spousal Property - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2005 |
CategorySpousal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeSpousal Property |
Case Cycle Time2509 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to J6 effective 04/13/2012. | |
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event | 06/30/2005: Spousal Property Order filed | |
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event | 06/30/2005: SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING Hearing: GRANTED | |
June 08, 2005 | Docket Event | 06/08/2005: Notice of Hearing re SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION filed | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/31/2005: (P) Petition filed Receipt Number: 505310406 for $255.0 Filed By: MAGALLANES, JOSE PEREZ(Decedent) | MAGALLANES, ALBERT R(Petitioner) | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/31/2005: Date of Death: 09/09/95 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.