Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2001 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned from 44 to J6 effective 04/13/2012. | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Order Granting (Petition for Waiver of Appraisal by Probate Referee, Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution) filed by Dykman, Shelee on 06/28/2010. | |
June 10, 2010 | Tentative Ruling |
Hearing Date: June 10, 2010 If it is your intention to submit on the tentative decision, all that is required is that you submit a telefax to Judge Kellegrew's secretary, Art Alvara, at 805.981.5929, ...
Judge: Kent Kellegrew |
|
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition for Final Distribution heard 06/10/2010 09:00:00 AM. | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Counsel Thomas Roth for petitioner has contacted the court (previous to the hearing) and is submitting on the tentative ruling and will not appear | |
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | received on 05/07/2010. Fee paid in full. | |
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Petition for Final Distribution - Petitition for Waiver of Appraisal by Probate Referee; Waiver of Accounting; and Final Distribution on Waiver of Appraisal and Accounting scheduled for 06/10/2010 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Petition for Final Distribution (Petitition for Waiver of Appraisal by Probate Referee; Waiver of Accounting; and Final Distribution on Waiver of Appraisal and Accounting) filed by Dykman, Shelee on 05/07/2010. | |
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing filed by Dykman, Shelee on 05/07/2010. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.