Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Riggs, Michelle Lene filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2001 |
CategoryHearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF VENTURA OXNARD DIVISION TENTATIVE RULINGS EVENT DATE: 08/16/2022 EVENT TIME: 10:30:00 AM DEPT.: J6 JUDICIAL OFFICER: Roger Lund CASE NUM: P075704 CASE TITLE: CN...
Judge: Roger L. Lund |
|
August 16, 2022 | Due 07/05/22 | ||
December 01, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF VENTURA OXNARD DIVISION TENTATIVE RULINGS EVENT DATE: 12/01/2020 EVENT TIME: 10:30:00 AM DEPT.: J6 JUDICIAL OFFICER: Roger Lund CASE NUM: P075704 CASE TITLE: CN...
Judge: Roger L. Lund |
|
December 01, 2020 | RE: Removal of Conservator | ||
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report Due 07/05/22 is scheduled for 08/16/2022 at 10:30AM in Department J6. | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report - Due 07/05/22 scheduled for 08/16/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Order Re Biennial Review Schedule) filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 12/01/2020. | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Status Report filed by RIGGS, ROBERT LYMAN on 11/04/2020. | |
October 06, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Limited Conservator's annual status report was due by July 2, 2020. As of September 29, 2020, it has not been filed. Unless the report is filed before the hearing, the Court will set an OSC re Removal...
Judge: Roger Lund |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.