Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Phillips, Frank C, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 1998 |
CategoryHearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF VENTURA OXNARD DIVISION TENTATIVE RULINGS EVENT DATE: 04/19/2022 EVENT TIME: 10:30:00 AM DEPT.: J6 JUDICIAL OFFICER: Roger Lund CASE NUM: P073643 CASE TITLE: CN...
Judge: Roger L. Lund |
|
March 15, 2022 | Due 02/16/22 | ||
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Status Report filed by KITAIN, DORIS on 01/13/2021. | |
April 21, 2020 | Due 02/14/2020 | ||
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report Due 02/16/22 is scheduled for 03/15/2022 at 10:30AM in Department J6. | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report - Due 02/16/22 scheduled for 03/15/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
March 17, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Verify Biennial Status Report (due by 2/14/20) ************************ Co-conservators' biennial status report was timely filed on 1/24/20. However, the Court advises that the form VN233 was revised ...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
March 17, 2020 | Due 02/14/2020 | ||
March 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report - Due 02/14/2020 scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
March 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance VENTURA generated. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.