We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Markus, William A Minor By Teri Markus, His Guardian Ad Litem ,
filed a(n)
Personal Injury -
Torts
case
against
Carrera, Dionisio ,
in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
This case was filed in
Alameda County
Superior Courts
with Gordon S. Baranco presiding.
Filing Date
June 07, 2007
Category
Personal Injury -Auto
Last Refreshed
March 29, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Plaintiffs
Markus, William A Minor By Teri Markus, His Guardian Ad Litem
Other Parties
Mitchell, Gail E (Leadattorney)
Case Events for
Markus, William A Minor By Teri Markus, His Guardian Ad Litem v. Carrera, Dionisio
Date
Type
Description
June 07, 2007
Failure to Prosecute
Judge: Gordon S. Baranco
June 07, 2007
Docket Event
Civil OSC Commenced and Completed
Get Document
June 07, 2007
Docket Event
Complaint Personal Injury Auto Dismissed
Get Document
April 27, 2007
Docket Event
Civil OSC 06/07/2007 02:00 PM D- 14
Get Document
January 10, 1997
Docket Event
REMARKS
July 23, 1996
Docket Event
REMARKS
July 23, 1996
Docket Event
ORDER SIGNED AND FILED GRANTING
July 01, 1996
Docket Event
CONTINUED: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/STATUS CONFERENCE/DISMISSAL 07/22/1996 02:00:00 PM D-14
July 01, 1996
Docket Event
CONTINUED: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/STATUS CONFERENCE/DISMISSAL 09/16/1996 02:00:00 PM D-14
July 01, 1996
Docket Event
REMARKS
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.