Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
New City Funding Corp., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Ashley Rivas, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason L Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason L Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 24, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 26, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 26, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: June 26, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 26, 2021ORDER - AWARDING FEE Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 21, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 10, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 10, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
||
July 21, 2021 |
ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1) and Authorizing Entry of Default Judgment |
||
June 26, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
June 26, 2021 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
June 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
June 26, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing |
||
June 26, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Military Status |
||
January 07, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.