Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Goldman Sachs Bank Usa, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Deery, Elizabeth Emily, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Susan Knepple, represented by Ward, Aubrey, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 12, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 27, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 07, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 27, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
March 18, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
January 07, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 07, 2020 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
December 07, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE SUSAN KNEPPLE |
||
November 12, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
November 12, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Loan Agreement |
||
November 12, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.